Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15314 Week
» 68330 Month
» 187857 Year
» 3214710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1236 |
m/e |
06/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12231 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52231 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
302 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/11/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1894 |
25D |
|
Mirfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26C |
|
Bolton |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/11/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1236 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 302 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12231 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52231 |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52231 |
|
|
01/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|