Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14058 Week
» 67074 Month
» 186601 Year
» 3213454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1238 |
m/e |
06/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12233 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52233 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
304 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/11/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1238 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 304 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12233 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52233 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52233 |
|
|