Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1404 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14810 Week
» 67826 Month
» 187353 Year
» 3214206 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1240 |
m/e |
07/1894 |
Pre Grouping |
6707 |
y/e |
1917 |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) |
1240 |
y/e |
1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12235 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52235 |
w/e |
15/07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
306 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/08/1957 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
25F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1907 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1240 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 306 |
|
|
08/1907 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1917 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6707 |
|
|
1919 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1240 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12235 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52235 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52235 |
|
|