Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4328 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17734 Week
» 70750 Month
» 190277 Year
» 3217130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1242 |
m/e |
07/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12237 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52237 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
18 |
Works Number |
308 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/03/1959 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1894 |
25F |
|
Low Moor |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25C |
|
Goole |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
25F |
|
Low Moor |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
26D |
|
Bury |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
26C |
|
Bolton |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
EXLOAN |
25F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1909 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1242 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 308 |
|
|
12/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12237 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52237 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52237 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|