Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4026 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17432 Week
» 70448 Month
» 189975 Year
» 3216828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1256 |
m/e |
09/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12252 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52252 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
19 |
Works Number |
324 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 10/11/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1894 |
24F |
|
Fleetwood |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
20C |
|
Royston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25C |
|
Goole |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
25C |
|
Goole |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1256 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 324 |
|
|
05/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12252 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52252 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
10/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52252 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|