Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 292 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1993 Week
» 10108 Month
» 137551 Year
» 1802927 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 410 m/e 10/1894
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12258 y/e 1924
British Railways 52258 w/e 01/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 19
Works Number 330
To Service During 10/1894
Withdrawal Sat 07/08/1954
Service Life 59 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1894
20C   Royston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 3w/e 24/01/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn on 07/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   on 07/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1894 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 410
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 330
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12258    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
01/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52258    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
07/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 52258    

prev prev