Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 261 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1962 Week
» 10077 Month
» 137520 Year
» 1802896 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 57 m/e 11/1894
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12260 y/e 1924
British Railways 52260 w/e 26/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 21
Works Number 332
To Service During 11/1894
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/04/1961
Service Life 66 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1894
24D   Lower Darwen on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree 4w/e 10/08/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 01/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 01/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1894 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 57
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 332
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12260    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
26/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52260    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
01/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52260    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev