|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/04/1948 | Horwich Works | On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1894 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 198 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 340 |
||
04/1910 | Modification | Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12268 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) | ||
24/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52268 | ||
08/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
17/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bacup (26E) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bacup (26E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
21/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 52268 | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |