Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 258 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1959 Week
» 10074 Month
» 137517 Year
» 1802893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 320 m/e 12/1894
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12615 y/e 1924
British Railways 52615 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 21
Works Number 344
To Service During 12/1894
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/06/1953
Service Life 58 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1894
26D   Bury on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree w/e 26/05/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
26F   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 27/06/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   w/e 27/06/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1902 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted
09/1922 Superheated boiler fitted
09/1922 Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1894 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 320
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 344
   
01/1902 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
09/1922 Modification Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted    
09/1922 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52615    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
27/06/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52615    

prev prev