Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14468 Week
» 67484 Month
» 187011 Year
» 3213864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
40 |
m/e |
06/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12278 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52278 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
23 |
Works Number |
372 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/07/1959 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1908 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 40 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 372 |
|
|
01/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12278 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52278 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52278 |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|