Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
51 |
m/e |
06/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12279 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52279 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
23 |
Works Number |
373 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/03/1953 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1895 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/03/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/03/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 51 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 373 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12279 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52279 |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
28/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52279 |
|
|