Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 614 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18417 Week
» 71433 Month
» 190960 Year
» 3217813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1280 |
m/e |
07/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12289 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52289 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
23 |
Works Number |
385 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/10/1959 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1911 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1280 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 385 |
|
|
06/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12289 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52289 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52289 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|