|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1895 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 365 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 396 |
||
03/1908 | Modification | Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12299 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bacup (26E) | ||
20/01/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52299 | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aintree (27B) | ||
04/09/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 52299 |