Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 310 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2011 Week
» 10126 Month
» 137569 Year
» 1802945 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 365 m/e 09/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12299 y/e 1924
British Railways 52299 w/e 20/01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 24
Works Number 396
To Service During 09/1895
Withdrawal Sat 04/09/1954
Service Life 59 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1895
26E   Bacup on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 15/09/1951
24D   Lower Darwen 4w/e 06/10/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 29/11/1952
     Withdrawn on 04/09/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   on 04/09/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1908 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 365
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 396
   
03/1908 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12299    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bacup (26E)    
20/01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 52299    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/09/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 52299    

prev prev