Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
372 |
m/e |
09/1895 |
Pre Grouping |
6714 |
m/e |
02/1917 |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) |
372 |
y/e |
1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12300 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52300 |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
24 |
Works Number |
397 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/01/1956 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 372 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 397 |
|
|
02/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
02/1917 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6714 |
|
|
1919 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 372 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12300 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52300 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
07/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52300 |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|