Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1550 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19353 Week
» 72369 Month
» 191896 Year
» 3218749 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
478 |
m/e |
11/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12311 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52311 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
24 |
Works Number |
409 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1962 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
11/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 478 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 409 |
|
|
05/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12311 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52311 |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52311 |
|
|