Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 313 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2014 Week
» 10129 Month
» 137572 Year
» 1802948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1308 m/e 02/1896
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12328 y/e 1924
British Railways 52328 w/e 17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 25
Works Number 428
To Service During 02/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/11/1957
Service Life 61 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1896
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 24/06/1950
26D   Bury w/e 21/10/1950
26D   Bury 4w/e 04/11/1950
26C   Bolton 8w/e 29/11/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 30/01/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 23/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 24/06/1950
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   w/e 23/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1908 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1308
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 428
   
09/1908 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12328    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
17/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52328    
24/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52328    
01/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev