Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 298 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1999 Week
» 10114 Month
» 137557 Year
» 1802933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 27 m/e 09/1896
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12333 y/e 1924
British Railways 52333 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 29
Works Number 474
To Service During 09/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/04/1953
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1896
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 24/06/1950
26B   Agecroft w/e 21/10/1950
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 04/11/1950
26C   Bolton 4w/e 26/01/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 18/04/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 24/06/1950
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   w/e 18/04/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 27
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 474
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12333    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52333    
24/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
18/04/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52333    

prev prev