Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
272 |
m/e |
10/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12338 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52338 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
29 |
Works Number |
479 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/06/1957 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1909 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 272 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 479 |
|
|
01/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12338 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52338 |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
08/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52338 |
|
|
08/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|