Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1626 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20537 Week
» 85491 Month
» 288155 Year
» 3315008 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
350 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
Pre Grouping |
6727 |
m/e |
07/1917 |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway (Revert) |
350 |
y/e |
1919 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12341 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52341 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
29 |
Works Number |
483 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/11/1960 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1917 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 350 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 483 |
|
|
07/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
07/1917 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6727 |
|
|
1919 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 350 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12341 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Moor Row (12E) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52341 |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52341 |
|
|