Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1314 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14720 Week
» 67736 Month
» 187263 Year
» 3214116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
360 |
m/e |
12/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12345 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52345 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
29 |
Works Number |
487 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
LOAN |
25F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
LOAN |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
MEECrewe |
|
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
LOAN |
26C |
Bolton |
8w/e |
05/09/1959 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
5w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1910 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 360 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 487 |
|
|
07/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12345 |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52345 |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (25C) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52345 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|