Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
419 |
m/e |
05/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12351 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52351 |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
31 |
Works Number |
513 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/08/1960 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
w/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
25F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1908 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 419 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 513 |
|
|
07/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12351 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52351 |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
15/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52351 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|