|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/03/1961 | Horwich Works (Scrap Yard) | Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1897 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 451 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 517 |
||
07/1911 | Modification | Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12355 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52355 | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
31/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
19/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) | ||
24/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 52355 | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |