Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2240 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 16283 Week
» 81237 Month
» 283901 Year
» 3310754 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
457 |
m/e |
06/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12357 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52357 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
31 |
Works Number |
519 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/08/1952 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 457 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 519 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12357 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52357 |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
30/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52357 |
|
|