Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 603 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3529 Week
» 5267 Month
» 132710 Year
» 1798086 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 491 m/e 08/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12366 y/e 1924
British Railways 52366 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 31
Works Number 530
To Service During 08/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/04/1958
Service Life 60 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1897
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/10/1954
10D   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 11/08/1956
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 12/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 14/07/1956
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   w/e 12/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 491
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 530
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12366    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52366    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    
12/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 52366    

prev prev