Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 305 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2006 Week
» 10121 Month
» 137564 Year
» 1802940 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 677 m/e 02/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12378 y/e 1924
British Railways 52378 w/e 18/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 33
Works Number 564
To Service During 02/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/10/1960
Service Life 62 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1898
26F   Lees (Oldham) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B   Aintree w/e 22/09/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 06/10/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 15/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 22/09/1951
WDN   w/e 15/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1907 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Longsight MPD Unusual visitors during October were: 4178 19B, 5185 10B, 5219 26A, 8824 10A, 9053 10A, 12378 26E. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 677
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 564
   
03/1907 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12378    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
18/03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52378    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52378    
11/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev