Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2016 Week
» 10131 Month
» 137574 Year
» 1802950 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 682 m/e 02/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12379 y/e 1924
British Railways 52379 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 33
Works Number 565
To Service During 02/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/04/1957
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1898
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27D     w/e 25/02/1950
27B   Aintree w/e 13/10/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 06/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27D   w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 13/10/1951
WDN   w/e 06/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1912 Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 682
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 565
   
12/1912 Modification Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12379    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52379    
25/02/1950 Allocation      
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
06/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52379    
05/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev