Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
682 |
m/e |
02/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12379 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52379 |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
33 |
Works Number |
565 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/04/1957 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1898 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
27D |
|
Carstairs |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
27B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
06/04/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27D |
Carstairs |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/04/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1912 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 682 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 565 |
|
|
12/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12379 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52379 |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (27D) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
06/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52379 |
|
|
05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|