Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 416 m/e 12/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12390 y/e 1924
British Railways 52390 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 39
Works Number 677
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/08/1956
Service Life 56 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1899
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 25/06/1949
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 5w/e 16/07/1949
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 09/08/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 25/08/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 09/08/1952
WDN   w/e 25/08/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1915 Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 416
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 677
   
04/1915 Modification Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12390    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52390    
25/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
25/08/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 52390    

prev prev