Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 329 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 10145 Month
» 137588 Year
» 1802964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 193 m/e 03/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12405 y/e 1924
British Railways 52405 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 40
Works Number 694
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1956
Service Life 56 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1900
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 11/08/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 19/04/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   w/e 22/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1912 Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 193
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 694
   
01/1912 Modification Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12405    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52405    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
22/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 52405    

prev prev