Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
605 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12431 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52431 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
42 |
Works Number |
746 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/11/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1913 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 605 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 746 |
|
|
07/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12431 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52431 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52431 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|