Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 914 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18717 Week
» 71733 Month
» 191260 Year
» 3218113 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
647 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12432 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52432 |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
42 |
Works Number |
747 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/11/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1910 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 647 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 747 |
|
|
08/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12432 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52432 |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52432 |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|