Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 298 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1999 Week
» 10114 Month
» 137557 Year
» 1802933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 838 m/e 09/1906
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12449 y/e 1924
British Railways 52449 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 53
Works Number 947
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/11/1957
Service Life 51 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1906
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2B   Nuneaton 8w/e 14/06/1952
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 29/11/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 02/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 85C Hereford 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   w/e 02/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 838
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 947
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12449    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52449    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
02/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52449    
12/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev