Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15327 Week
» 68343 Month
» 187870 Year
» 3214723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
919 |
m/e |
08/1917 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12461 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52461 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
75 |
Works Number |
1264 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/11/1962 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/1961 |
Wakefield MPD(56A) |
60140 (56C) was under repair on 26th August; of Wakefield's five passenger turns, four are allocated to Bls and one only to a 2-6-4T with the result that the 2-6-2Ts are out of use but only 40074/147/90 appear to be stored. Two jobs are still worked by 'Jinties', shed pilot and Batley no. 1 (Batley no. 2 is a J50). Wakefield's last two LYR locomotives are 52413/61 in store in the yard. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 919 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1264 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12461 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52461 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) |
|
|
12/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52461 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|