Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 313 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2014 Week
» 10129 Month
» 137572 Year
» 1802948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 926 m/e 11/1917
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12464 y/e 1924
British Railways 52464 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 11
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 75
Works Number 1268
To Service During 11/1917
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1961
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1917
26F   Lees (Oldham) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26F   Lees (Oldham) m/e 31/12/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 29/12/1951
     To Crewe Works 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 29/12/1951
LOAN CreweWorks   4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC MEECrewe   4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   w/e 22/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Works Shunters) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 926
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1268
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12464    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
23/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52464    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
22/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52464    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev