Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 385 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18188 Week
» 71204 Month
» 190731 Year
» 3217584 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
254 |
m/e |
05/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16372 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
56372 |
|
01/01/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
782 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
Order Number |
Y127 |
To Service |
During 05/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/05/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12H |
Stranraer |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
06/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
13/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/05/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/08/1952 |
Stranraer MPD |
The following locos. were on shed: 41099 (68C), 600/11/16 (68C), 45480 (68B) and 57445 (68C). Visitors included 48758 (68A), 44706 (67A) and 42919 (68B). 44101 was working the 10.0 p.m. Stranraer-College freight and 45642 Rodney the 9.15 p.m. 'Northern Irishman.' Shunting duties are performed by 0-4-4T 55125 and 0-6-OT 56372 an 56234. The latter shunts the Harbour Station. |
SLS/195211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 254 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 16372 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stranraer (12H) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 56372 |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
11/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 56372 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|