Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1764 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15170 Week
» 68186 Month
» 187713 Year
» 3214566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
244 |
m/e |
11/1881 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3745 |
m/e |
09/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7590 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) |
27590 |
y/e |
1935 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2492 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 11/1881 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1947 |
Service Life |
66 yrs |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1881 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
28/06/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/11/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1881 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 244 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2492 |
|
|
09/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3745 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7590 |
|
|
1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27590 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27590 |
|
|