Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 870 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14276 Week
» 67292 Month
» 186819 Year
» 3213672 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
252 |
m/e |
12/1881 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3751 |
m/e |
09/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7596 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) |
27596 |
m/e |
04/1936 |
British Railways |
58887 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2498 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 12/1881 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/04/1955 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
Information |
Withdrawn 3/39 Reinstated 1940 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1881 |
4A |
|
Bletchley |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
4A |
|
Bletchley |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1881 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 252 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2498 |
|
|
09/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3751 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7596 |
|
|
04/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27596 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58887 |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
09/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58887 |
|
|