Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 775 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1849 Week
» 27210 Month
» 260130 Year
» 1925506 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 679 m/e 09/1882
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7603 m/e 09/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) 27603 y/e 1935
British Railways 58889 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2570
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 09/1882
Withdrawal Mon 31/08/1953
Service Life 71 yrs

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1882
7D   Rhyl w/e 08/05/1948
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1950
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn m/e 31/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   m/e 31/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1934 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1882 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 679
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2570
   
09/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 7603    
04/1934 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 27603    
08/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58889    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
31/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58889    

prev prev