Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
277 |
m/e |
01/1883 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3763 |
m/e |
10/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7621 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) |
27621 |
m/e |
03/1935 |
British Railways |
58891 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2593 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 01/1883 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1955 |
Service Life |
72 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1883 |
4D |
|
Abergavenny |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
08/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1931 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1883 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 277 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2593 |
|
|
10/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3763 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7621 |
|
|
03/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
03/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27621 |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58891 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58891 |
|
|
09/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|