Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 748 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1822 Week
» 27183 Month
» 260103 Year
» 1925479 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 692 m/e 07/1883
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7654 m/e 02/1928
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) 27654 m/e 05/1935
British Railways 58895 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2655
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 07/1883
Withdrawal During 10/1951
Service Life 68 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1883
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4E Tredegar w/e 06/12/1947
WDN   w/e 06/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1926 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/04/1947 Crewe Works A further four new Class 5 4-6-0's have been completed here - Nos. 4769-4772, and 4-6-2 No. 6242 has had the streamline casing removed. The following were in the Works yard on 26/4 awaiting cutting-up:- 6652, 6690, 6755, 6870, 6925, 6936, 7765, 7772, 7795, 25304, 25802, 27555, 27654, 27493, 28117 and 27558, the latter having been partially cut-up. It is understood that the order for new Class 5 4-6-0's to be built at Crewe comprises Nos. 4738-4782 whilst Horwich will build Nos. 4783-4799. SLS/194706
16/05/1948 Abergavenny MPD At Abergavenny both Nos. 1202/3 were on shed and No. 9019 worked the 5.5 p.m. to Merthyr. No. 27654 was banking freight trains up to Llanvihangel and other coal tanks at work were Nos. 7808, 7782 an 7816. No. 1204 was at Tredegar but was being sent to Abergavenny for washout during the weekend and No. 1203 was sent to replace it. The 7.52 p.m. from Tredegar to Newport was worked by No. 9409. It is of interest to note that some of the highest points reached by the railways in Britain are on the Abergavenny-Merthyr line, and its branches, and it is no small tribute to the L.N.W.R. locomotives concerned that they are still entrusted with most of the trains over tne severe gradients encountered SLS/194807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1883 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 692
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2655
   
01/1926 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 7654    
05/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 27654    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58895 but not taken up    
10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 27654    

prev prev