Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3406 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16812 Week
» 69828 Month
» 189355 Year
» 3216208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1112 |
m/e |
11/1883 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7674 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Duplicate) |
27674 |
y/e |
1935 |
British Railways |
58897 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2699 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 11/1883 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1950 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1883 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1112 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2699 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7674 |
|
|
1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27674 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58897 |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58897 |
|
|
11/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|