Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 29 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4006 Week
» 15243 Month
» 248163 Year
» 1913539 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 6 m/e 04/1884
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) 3336 m/e 11/1920
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7692 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 58899 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2779
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 04/1884
Withdrawal During 08/1954
Service Life 70 yrs , 4 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1884
2B   Bletchley w/e 03/07/1948
4D   Abergavenny w/e 23/10/1948
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
     Withdrawn m/e 08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 03/07/1948
LOAN 4D Abergavenny w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1928 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1884 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 6
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2779
   
11/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 3336    
01/1928 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 7692    
03/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (2B)    
23/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D)    
28/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58899    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58899    

prev prev