Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14165 Week
» 67181 Month
» 186708 Year
» 3213561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
186 |
m/e |
09/1884 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3724 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7699 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
58900 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2786 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 09/1884 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1954 |
Service Life |
70 yrs , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1947 |
Moor Row MPD |
Living up to its pre-grouping reputation of housing a considerable variety of older locomotive types, Moor Row shed was well worth a visit over Easter week-end. The present stud consists of seven ex-L. & Y. 0-6-0's; three standard 0-6-0 shunting tanks; two Webb 'Coal' tanks; one 'Cauliflower' and four ex F.R. 0-6-0's. Of the latter, 12508 was away for heavy repairs while the remaining three, 12494, 12499, and 12510 were all 'on the active list.' The running of the 9.20 p.m. passenger train from Barrow to Whitehaven is always entrusted to 12499, since she is the only engine at Moor Row capable of maintaining the schedule, or improving it. The load is usually 6 to 8 bogies. During a recent overhaul at Horwich the boilers of 12494 and 12510 were exchanged and now 12494, instead of 12510, is the only example at Moor Row of an F.R. engine with the original type of round-topped boiler: the others carry Belpaire boilers of the L. & Y. type. The two Webb 0 6 2 tanks are 7699 and 27553. Both were sent to Moor Row to work the re-established passenger service between Whitehaven, Moor Row, Egremont and Sellafleld. 7699 still carries her 2A shed plate, but 27553 has had her's (10E) removed. The single 'Cauliflower' is No. 28441. The three standard shunting tanks are 7317, 7337, and 7390, and they are regarded as the best locomotives at the depot. The L. & Y. types are a motley collection, the latest addition being 12551, the only superheated engine at Moor Row. She still carries a 10B shed plate and is in very indifferent order. An unusual visitor to this area has been 4-4-0 No. 673 which, was attached to Moor Row shed from Upperby for special duty. When she arrived she was nearly due for a major overhaul and is now standing outside the shed, with coupling rods removed, waiting to be removed to Derby for repairs. |
SLS/194705 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1884 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 186 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2786 |
|
|
03/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3724 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7699 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58900 |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
10/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58900 |
|
|