Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18929 Week
» 71945 Month
» 191472 Year
» 3218325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1207 |
m/e |
01/1885 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7720 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
58904 |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2822 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 01/1885 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/09/1955 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1885 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
4A |
|
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
w/e |
19/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1930 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1885 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1207 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2822 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7720 |
|
|
11/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58904 |
|
|
09/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58904 |
|
|