Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1591 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14997 Week
» 68013 Month
» 187540 Year
» 3214393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
359 |
m/e |
07/1886 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3325 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7737 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
58908 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2878 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 07/1886 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/11/1951 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1934 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1886 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 359 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2878 |
|
|
11/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3325 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7737 |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58908 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (4E) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
01/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
10/11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58908 |
|
|