Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1906 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19709 Week
» 72725 Month
» 192252 Year
» 3219105 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
417 |
m/e |
12/1886 |
London and North Western Railway (Duplicate) |
3387 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7759 |
y/e |
1928 |
British Railways |
58916 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2937 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 12/1886 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1950 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1886 |
4D |
|
Abergavenny |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/10/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3E |
Monument Lane |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1886 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 417 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2937 |
|
|
11/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3387 |
|
|
1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7759 |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58916 |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58916 |
|
|