Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 33 Online
» 810 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1884 Week
» 27245 Month
» 260165 Year
» 1925541 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 592 m/e 06/1887
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7791 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 58924 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2969
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 06/1887
Withdrawal Thu 30/09/1954
Service Life 67 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1954

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1887
7D   Rhyl w/e 18/02/1950
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/10/1950
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/05/1954
     Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 18/02/1950
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/05/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1887 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 592
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2969
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 7791    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58924    
18/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
30/09/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58924    
10/1954 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev