Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1676 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15082 Week
» 68098 Month
» 187625 Year
» 3214478 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
596 |
m/e |
06/1887 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7794 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
58925 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Coal Tank |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2972 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram Precursor | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 06/1887 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/09/1955 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
4E |
Tredegar |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
86K |
Abergavenny |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1925 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1887 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 596 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 2972 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7794 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tredegar (4E) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58925 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K) |
|
|
09/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58925 |
|
|