Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 35 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4012 Week
» 15249 Month
» 248169 Year
» 1913545 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 1255 m/e 07/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7821 m/e 08/1928
British Railways 58931 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3318
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram Precursor
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal Sat 27/03/1948
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1948

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1892
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 22/06/1946
     Withdrawn on 27/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 27/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Crewe Works The first three Caprotti Class '5's' of Order E.469 Nos. 44738-40 were completed on 16/4 (44738 ), 21/4 (44739 ) and 28/4 (44740 ). They are the first of ten Caprotti engines to be equipped with plain bearings. The latest 'Royal Scot' to undergo conversion was No. 6105 which was completed on 9/4, whilst the next two 'Patriot' 4-6-0's to be rebuilt are Nos. 5532 an 5512 (in that order). It is interesting to note that these two engines are to receive new frames, hitherto, of course, all converted 'Patriot' 4-6-0's have had their original frames modified. More ex L.N.W. withdrawn locomotives have gone to the scrap heap recently. They were cut up as follows:-W/E 10/4 7946; W/E 17/4 6919, 7709, 25321; W/E 24/4 6728, 6926, 28153; W/E 1/5 9231, 9274, 25827; W/E 8/5 7821, 9250. Several ex W.D. 2-8-0 tenders recently arrived from Swindon. Four of them were fitted to ex L.M.S. 2-8-0's to replace the tenders sent to the Southern Region for use on the ex S.R. locomotives taking part in the exchange trials. Three ex S.R. boilers of the 4-4-0 'Schools' Class recently arrived here for repair, and it is understood that more are to follow. SLS/194806
31/05/1948 Crewe Works New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively.
Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484.
A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines.
Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright
SLS/194807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1255
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3318
   
08/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 7821    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 58931 but not taken up    
27/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 7821    
05/1948 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev